Zahavi, Michael Andrew (CPSO#: 60964)

Current Status: Active Member as of 28 Jun 1990

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 28 Jun 1990


Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1989

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Unit 17
600 King Street East
Oshawa ON  L1H 1G6
Phone: (905) 432-1017
Fax: (905) 432-0070
Electoral District: 05
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Suite 102
8920 Woodbine Avenue
Markham ON  L3R 9W9
Phone: (905) 305-9484
Fax: (905) 305-7381
County: Regional Municipality of York
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Michael Zahavi Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 16 2015

Dr. M. Zahavi ( CPSO# 60964 )

Business Address:
Unit 17
600 King Street East
Oshawa ON  L1H 1G6
Phone Number: (905) 432-1017

Business Address:
Suite 102
8920 Woodbine Avenue
Markham ON  L3R 9W9
Phone Number: (905) 305-9484

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Lakeridge Health,Oshawa General Site Oshawa


Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 29 Sep 2009 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions


(1) Dr. MICHAEL ANDREW ZAHAVI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ZAHAVI is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 12 Jun 1989
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 11 Jun 1990
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Jun 1990