Zahedi, Afshan (CPSO#: 69245)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1995

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 12 Aug 1999

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Farsi

Education:University of Toronto, 1995

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Unit 310
3443 Finch Avenue East
Toronto ON  M1W 2S1
Phone: (416) 495-1830
Fax: (416) 495-1389
Electoral District: 10
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Women's College Hospital
76 Grenville Street
Toronto ON  M5S 1B2
Canada
Phone: (416) 323-6400 Ext. 4874
Fax: (416) 323-2669
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Mount Sinai Hospital
600 University Ave
Toronto ON  M5G 1X5
Canada
Phone: (416) 586-4800
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

The Scarborough and Rouge Hospital
Birchmount Campus
3030 Birchmount Road
Scarborough ON  M1W 3W3
Canada
Phone: (416) 495-2600
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Zahedi Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 29 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Zahedi ( CPSO# 69245 )

Business Address:
Suite 310
3443 Finch Avenue East
Toronto ON  M1W 2S1
Phone Number: (416) 569-6672

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Mount Sinai Hospital Toronto
Scarborough Hospital-Birchmount Campus Toronto
Women's College Hospital Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 31 Jul 1999 RCPSC Specialist
Endocrinology and Metabolism Effective: 07 Sep 2000 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. AFSHAN ZAHEDI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ZAHEDI is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 4 - Endocrinology and Metabolism

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1999 to 31 Aug 1999
PostGrad Yr 4 - Endocrinology and Metabolism

University of Toronto, 01 Sep 1999 to 31 Aug 2000
PostGrad Yr 5 - Endocrinology and Metabolism

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1995
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 12 Aug 1999