Zahradnik, Josef (CPSO#: 56490)

Current Status: Active Member as of 09 Sep 1991

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 09 Sep 1991

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Czech, English, Slovak

Education:Charles Univ Prague Fac General Medicine, 1974

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Peterborough Regional Health Centre
Women's Health Clinic
1 Hospital Drive
Peterborough ON  K9J 7C6
Phone: (705) 743-2121 Ext. 5117
Electoral District: 06
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

117 Roper Drive
Peterborough ON  K9J 6K3
Canada
Phone: (705) 876-6927
County: County of Peterborough
Electoral District: 06
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Zahradnik Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 05 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Zahradnik ( CPSO# 56490 )

Business Address:
117 Roper Drive
Peterborough ON  K9J 6K3
Phone Number: (705) 876-6927

Business Address:
Women's Health Clinic
Peterborough Regional Health Centre
1 Hospital Drive
Peterborough ON  K9J 7C6
Phone Number: (705) 876-5038

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Peterborough Regional Health Centre Peterborough

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Obstetrics and Gynecology Effective: 07 Jun 1991 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JOSEF ZAHRADNIK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ZAHRADNIK is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 31 Dec 1985
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1987
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 13 Sep 1988
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1991
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 09 Sep 1991