Zajner, Michael Walter Joseph (CPSO#: 59643)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Jun 1988

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 20 Jul 1989

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 1988

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
South Walkerville Medical Building
2224 Walker Road
Suite 133
Windsor ON  N8W 5L7
Phone: (519) 255-7366
Fax: (888) 600-1292
Electoral District: 01
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Michael Zajner Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 13 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Zajner ( CPSO# 59643 )

Business Address:
Suite 133
2224 Walker Road
Windsor ON  N8W 5L7
Phone Number: (519) 255-7366

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Windsor Regional Hospital,Ouellette Campus Windsor

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 12 Jun 1990 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MICHAEL WALTER JOSEPH ZAJNER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ZAJNER is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 15 Jun 1988 to 14 Jun 1989
Other - Comprehensive Internship

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1988
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Jul 1989