Zakaria, Muhammed (CPSO#: 53217)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Sep 1988

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 15 Sep 1988

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Bengali, English

Education:Dacca Medical College, 1976

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Mental Health Services
Lakeridge Health
1 Hospital Court
Oshawa ON  L1G 2B9
Phone: (905) 576-8711 Ext. 3762
Fax: (905) 721-4742
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Muhammed Zakaria Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 17 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Zakaria ( CPSO# 53217 )

Business Address:
Mental Health Services
Lakeridge Health
1 Hospital Court
Oshawa ON  L1G 2B9
Phone Number: (905) 576-8711

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Lakeridge Health,Oshawa General Site Oshawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 17 Nov 1987 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MUHAMMED ZAKARIA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ZAKARIA is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1983
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1987
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Sep 1988