Zakhary, Gamel Saad (CPSO#: 51993)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1984

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 23 Dec 1986

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Arabic, English

Education:Ain Shams University, 1977

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
40 Finchgate Boulevard
Suite 123
Brampton ON  L6T 3J1
Phone: (905) 793-7855
Fax: 905-452-5468
Electoral District: 05
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

305, Royal West Drive
Unit # K
Brampton
Brampton ON  L6X 5K8
Canada
Phone: (905)452-0200
Fax: (905)452-0212
County: Regional Municipality of Peel
Electoral District: 05

380, Bovaird Dr E
Brampton
Brampton ON  L6Z 2S8
Canada
Phone: (905)840-3900
Fax: (905)840-3912
County: Regional Municipality of Peel
Electoral District: 05

127 Westmore Dr
Unit # 102
Etobicoke ON  M9V 3Y6
Canada
Phone: (416) 740-7888
Fax: (416) 740-7888
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. G. Zakhary Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 14 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. G. Zakhary ( CPSO# 51993 )

Business Address:
6620 Finch Avenue West
Toronto ON  M9V 5H7
Phone Number: (416) 740-7888

Business Address:
380 Bovaird Drive East
Brampton ON  L6Z 2S8
Phone Number: (905) 840-3900

Business Address:
305 Royal West Drive
Brampton ON  L6C 5K8
Phone Number: (905) 452-0200

Business Address:
Suite 123
40 Finchgate Boulevard
Bramalea ON  L6T 3J1
Phone Number: (905) 793-7855

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
William Osler - Peel Memorial Centre,for Integrated Health and Wellness Brampton
William Osler Health Centre Etobicoke General Site Toronto
William Osler Health Centre-Brampton Civic Hospital Brampton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 18 Nov 1987 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. GAMEL SAAD ZAKHARY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ZAKHARY is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1981
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 13 Jun 1983
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1984
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Dec 1986