Zakhary, Liliane Henri (CPSO#: 54470)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1984

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 11 Jul 1988

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: Arabic, English, French

Education:Ain Shams University, 1977

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
100 Humber College Boulevard
Suite 401
Etobicoke ON  M9V 5G4
Phone: (416) 747-7122
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. L. Zakhary Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 14 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. L. Zakhary ( CPSO# 54470 )

Business Address:
Suite 401
100 Humber College Boulevard
Toronto ON  M9V 5G4

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 19 Nov 1990 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. LILIANE HENRI ZAKHARY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ZAKHARY is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Resident 4 - Pediatrics

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1984
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 11 Jul 1988