Zalan, Elise Julie (CPSO#: 98284)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2012

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 02 Jan 2018

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Northern Ontario School Of Medicine, 2012

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Children's Hospital of Eastern
Ontario
Department of Anesthesiology
401 Smyth Road
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L1
Phone: (613) 737-2431
Electoral District: 07

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 11 Nov 2017 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ELISE JULIE ZALAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ZALAN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Anesthesiology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Anesthesiology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 3 - Anesthesiology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 4 - Anesthesiology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2016 to 11 Nov 2016
PostGrad Yr 4 - Anesthesiology

Queen's University, 12 Nov 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 5 - Anesthesiology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2017 to 11 Nov 2017
PostGrad Yr 5 - Anesthesiology

University of Ottawa, 12 Nov 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2012
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 02 Jan 2018