Zalan, Robert Matthew (CPSO#: 79104)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2003

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2008

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 2003

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
North York General Hospital
Psychiatry Department
Room 8N 809
4001 Leslie Street
Toronto ON  M2K 1E1
Phone: (416) 756-6655
Fax: (416) 756-6671
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Robert M. Zalan Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 12 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. R. Zalan ( CPSO# 79104 )

Business Address:
North York General Hopsital
Psychiatry Department
Suite 8N-809
4001 Leslie Street
Toronto ON  M2K 1E1
Phone Number: (416) 756-6655

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
North York General Hospital,General Division Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 30 Jun 2008 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ROBERT MATTHEW ZALAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ZALAN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 1 - Psychiatry

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 2 - Psychiatry

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 3 - Psychiatry

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 4 - Psychiatry

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2003
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2008