Zaleski, Witold Michael (CPSO#: 52861)

Current Status: Active Member as of 31 Jul 1989

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 02 Nov 1989

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French, Polish

Education:University of Saskatchewan, 1983

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Department of Radiology
London Health Sciences Centre
Victoria Hospital - Suite D1-104
800 Commissioners Road East
London ON  N6A 4G5
Phone: (519) 685-8500 Ext. 55006
Fax: (519) 667-6771
Electoral District: 02
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: W. M. Zaleski Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 22 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. W. Zaleski ( CPSO# 52861 )

Business Address:
London Health Sciences Centre
Victoria Hospital
Department of Radiology
D1-104 - 800 Commissioners Road East
London ON  N6A 4G5
Phone Number: (519) 685-8500

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital London
London Health Sciences Centre,Children's Hospital of Western Ontario London
London Health Sciences Centre,University Site London
St Joseph's Health Care-St Joseph's Site,London London

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective: 02 Jun 1988 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. WITOLD MICHAEL ZALESKI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ZALESKI is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1983
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1988
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Hospital Practice Certificate Effective: 31 Jul 1989
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 02 Nov 1989