Zalev, Arthur Harold (CPSO#: 24495)

Current Status: Active Member as of 19 Apr 1972

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 19 Apr 1972

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1970

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
St Michael's Hospital
Department Of Radiology
30 Bond Street
Toronto ON  M5B 1W8
Phone: (416) 864-5740
Fax: (416) 864-5830
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Common Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 20 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. B. Gray ( CPSO# 58202 )
Dr. F. Goldberg ( CPSO# 50752 )
Dr. T. Dowdell ( CPSO# 55456 )
Dr. A. Bharatha ( CPSO# 79389 )
Dr. E. Colak ( CPSO# 79512 )
Dr. A. Common ( CPSO# 59024 )
Dr. P. Vlachou ( CPSO# 90004 )
Dr. D. Deva ( CPSO# 93514 )
Dr. G. Mnatzakanian ( CPSO# 88831 )
Dr. J. Barfett ( CPSO# 84352 )
Dr. A. Zalev ( CPSO# 24495 )
Dr. D. Sarma ( CPSO# 76653 )
Dr. V. Prabhudesai ( CPSO# 81446 )
Dr. D. Pearce ( CPSO# 65503 )
Dr. L. Noel De Tilly ( CPSO# 62846 )
Dr. D. Muradali ( CPSO# 59826 )
Dr. W. Montanera ( CPSO# 31960 )
Dr. T. Marotta ( CPSO# 53911 )
Dr. D. Marcuzzi ( CPSO# 54207 )
Dr. W. Mak ( CPSO# 85186 )
Dr. A. Kirpalani ( CPSO# 74950 )

Business Address:
St. Michael's Hospital
30 Bond Street
Toronto ON  M5B 1W8
Phone Number: (416) 864-5680


Corporation Name: Dr. Arthur H. Zalev Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 28 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Zalev ( CPSO# 24495 )

Business Address:
St. Michael's Hospital
Department of Radiology
30 Bond Street
Toronto ON  M5B 1W8
Phone Number: (416) 864-5740

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
St Michael's Hospital Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective: 06 Nov 1975 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ARTHUR HAROLD ZALEV may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ZALEV is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 18 Jun 1970
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 17 Jun 1971
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Apr 1972