Find A Doctor will be undergoing maintenance between 6:00pm on Friday, December 15, 2017 and 12:00 noon on Saturday, December 16, 2017. You may experience intermittent service interruptions during this time. We apologize for the inconvenience.

×Close

Zalewski, Pawel Gerard (CPSO#: 68393)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1994

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 19 Feb 1996

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Polish, Russian

Education:Academy of Medicine, Warsaw, 1988

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Durham Regional Cancer Centre
Lakeridge Health Oshawa
1 Hospital Court
Oshawa ON  L1G 2B9
Phone: (905) 576-8711 Ext. 3625
Fax: (905) 721-6103
Electoral District: 05
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

One Hospital Drive
Peterborough ON  K9J 7C6
Canada
Phone: (705) 740-8326
Fax: (705) 740-8125
County: County of Peterborough
Electoral District: 06

1000 Depalma Drive
Cobourg ON  K9A 5W6
Canada
Phone: 905 3726811 Ext. 3016
County: County of Northumberland
Electoral District: 06
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Pawel Zalewski Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 11 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. P. Zalewski ( CPSO# 68393 )

Business Address:
1000 Depalma Drive
Cobourg ON  K9A 5W6
Phone Number: (905) 372-6811

Business Address:
Durham Regional Cancer Centre
Lakeridge Health Oshawa
1 Hospital Court
Oshawa ON  L1G 2B9
Phone Number: (905) 576-8711

Business Address:
1 Hospital Drive
Peterborough ON  K9J 7C6
Phone Number: (905) 740-8326

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Lakeridge Health,Oshawa General Site Oshawa
Northumberland Hills Hospital,Cobourg District General Site Cobourg
Peterborough Regional Health Centre Peterborough

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 15 Nov 1995 RCPSC Specialist
Medical Oncology Effective: 05 Sep 1996 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. PAWEL GERARD ZALEWSKI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ZALEWSKI is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 4 - Medical Oncology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 5 - Medical Oncology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1994
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Feb 1996