Zaltzman, Jeffery Steven (CPSO#: 60482)

Current Status: Active Member as of 29 Dec 1988

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 29 Dec 1988

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:McGill University, 1985

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
St Michaels Hospital
Suite 9-118
61 Queen Street East
Toronto ON  M5C 2T2
Phone: (416) 867-7444
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Zaltzman Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 18 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Zaltzman ( CPSO# 60482 )
Dr. C. Bassoon-Zaltzman ( CPSO# 60485 )

Business Address:
Bathurst Steeles Health Centre
2nd Floor
6257 Bathurst Street
Willowdale ON  M2R 2A5
Phone Number: (416) 223-9791

Business Address:
St. Michael's Hospital
Suite 9-118
61 Queen Street East
Toronto ON  M5C 2T2
Phone Number: (416) 867-7444

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
St Michael's Hospital Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 04 Jun 1990 RCPSC Specialist
Nephrology Effective: 06 Sep 1991 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JEFFERY STEVEN ZALTZMAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ZALTZMAN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Clinical Fellow - Nephrology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Dec 1988