Zamakhshary, Mohammed Fouad Tahir (CPSO#: 83636)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 30 Jun 2007

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 30 Jun 2007

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:King Abdul Aziz University, 1998

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 30 Jun 2005 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 17 Aug 2005 to 25 Sep 2005
PEAP - Resident - Pediatric General Surgery

University of Toronto, 26 Sep 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 6 - Pediatric General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 26 Sep 2006
PostGrad Yr 6 - Pediatric General Surgery

University of Toronto, 27 Sep 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 7 - Pediatric General Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 17 Aug 2005
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 26 Sep 2005
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2007