Zaman-Haque, Abeyat (CPSO#: 98500)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Aug 2017

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 01 Aug 2017

Summary

Former Name: Zaman, Abeyat (used until: 24 Sep 2012 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: Bengali, English

Education:The University of Manitoba, 2012

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
One Care Medical Clinic
1755 Brimley Rd.
Toronto ON  M1P 0A3
Phone: (416) 290-0361
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: K. Zaman Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 30 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. K. Zaman ( CPSO# 90195 )
Dr. A. Zaman-Haque ( CPSO# 98500 )
Dr. N. Zaman ( CPSO# 103331)

Business Address:
Dawes Family Practice and Walk-In
2772 Danforth Avenue
Toronto ON  M4C 1L7
Phone Number: (416) 690-1042

Business Address:
3502 Danforth Avenue
Toronto ON  M1L 1E1
Phone Number: (647) 984-6172

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 25 May 2017 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ABEYAT ZAMAN-HAQUE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ZAMAN-HAQUE is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Pediatrics

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Pediatrics

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2014 to 11 Jul 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Pediatrics

The University of Western Ontario, 12 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 3 - Pediatrics

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2015 to 11 Jul 2015
PostGrad Yr 3 - Pediatrics

The University of Western Ontario, 12 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 4 - Pediatrics

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2016 to 28 Jul 2016
PostGrad Yr 4 - Pediatrics

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2012
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 28 Jul 2016
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 01 Sep 2016
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 31 Aug 2019
Terms and conditions amended by Effective: 31 Aug 2019
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Aug 2017