Zamora, Mary Margaret (CPSO#: 55633)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Jun 1985

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 13 Apr 1987

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 1985

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 200
1235 Trafalgar Road
Oakville ON  L6H 3P1
Phone: (905) 844-3281
Fax: (905) 849-1076
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. James Kovacs Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 17 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Zamora ( CPSO# 55633 )
Dr. J. Kovacs ( CPSO# 59751 )

Business Address:
802 - 5500 North Service Road
Burlington ON  L7L 6W6
Phone Number: (905) 335-1100


Corporation Name: Dr. Mary Zamora Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 02 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Zamora ( CPSO# 55633 )
Dr. J. Kovacs ( CPSO# 59751 )

Business Address:
Suite 200
1235 Trafalgar Road
Oakville ON  L6H 3P1
Phone Number: (905) 844-3281

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Oakville Trafalgar Memorial Hospital Oakville

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Jul 1987 CFPC Specialist
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine) Effective: 01 Nov 1988 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MARY MARGARET ZAMORA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ZAMORA is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1985
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 13 Apr 1987