Zanbilowicz, Jose (CPSO#: 26234)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 18 Jun 2002

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 18 Jun 2002

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:McGill University, 1970

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective: 05 Nov 1974 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 08 Nov 1973
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 19 Mar 1979
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 May 2001
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 18 Jun 2002