Zando, Iram Kareemi (CPSO#: 59919)

Current Status: Active Member as of 13 Jun 1988

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 20 Dec 1989

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Hindi, Urdu

Education:Fatima Jinnah Medical College, 1985

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Credit Valley Health Center
Unit 16
2555 Erin Centre Blvd
Mississauga ON  L5M 5H1
Phone: (905) 828-0270
Fax: (905) 828-0277
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Iram K. Zando Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Jun 27 2008


Corporation Name: Iram K. Zando Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 30 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. I. Zando ( CPSO# 59919 )

Business Address:
Suite 16
2555 Erin Centre Boulevard
Mississauga ON  L5M 5H1

Business Address:
344 Kerr Street
Oakville ON  L6K 3B8

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Georgian Bay General Hospital Midland

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 17 Nov 1993 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. IRAM KAREEMI ZANDO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ZANDO is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Resident 3 - Internal Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 13 Jun 1988
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Dec 1989