Zanette, Christopher George (CPSO#: 99405)

Current Status: Active Member as of 22 Oct 2012

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 31 Oct 2014

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:National University of Ireland, 2012

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Royal Victoria Hospital
Emergency Department
201 Georgian Dr, Barrie, ON L4M 6M2
Barrie ON  L4M 6M2
Phone: (705) 728-9802
Electoral District: 05
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Thunder Bay Regional Health
Sciences Centre
980 Oliver Road, Thunder Bay, ON
Thunder Bay ON  P7B 6V4
Canada
Phone: 807-684-6100
County: District of Thunder Bay
Electoral District: 09
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Christopher Zanette Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 27 2016

Shareholders:
Dr. C. Zanette ( CPSO# 99405 )

Business Address:
Thunder Bay Regional Health Sciences Centre
Academic Affairs Office
980 Oliver Road
Thunder Bay ON  P7B 6V4
Phone Number: (807) 684-6100

Business Address:
Royal Victoria Hospital
Emergency Department
201 Georgian Drive
Barrie ON  L4M 6M2
Phone Number: (705) 728-9802

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Royal Victoria Regional Health Centre Barrie
Thunder Bay Regional Health Sciences Centre Thunder Bay

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 21 Oct 2014 CFPC Specialist
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine) Effective: 27 Oct 2015 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. CHRISTOPHER GEORGE ZANETTE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ZANETTE is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

Northern Ontario School Of Medicine, 22 Oct 2012 to 13 Jan 2013
Assessment Verification Period - Family Medicine

Northern Ontario School Of Medicine, 14 Jan 2013 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Northern Ontario School Of Medicine, 01 Jul 2013 to 20 Oct 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Northern Ontario School Of Medicine, 21 Oct 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Northern Ontario School Of Medicine, 01 Jul 2014 to 19 Oct 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Northern Ontario School Of Medicine, 20 Oct 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 22 Oct 2012
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 14 Jan 2013
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 31 Oct 2014