Zanette, Paul Anthony (CPSO#: 71211)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1997

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 19 Jun 1999

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Italian

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1997

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
All-In-One Health Care Clinic
Suite 100
10083 Keele Street
Maple ON  L6A 3Y8
Phone: (905) 832-4644
Fax: (905) 832-7717
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Paul A. Zanette Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 11 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. P. Zanette ( CPSO# 71211 )

Business Address:
All-In-One Health Care Clinic
100 - 10083 Keele Street
Maple ON  L6A 3Y8
Phone Number: (905) 832-4644

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Mackenzie Health,Richmond Hill Richmond Hill

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 15 Jun 1999 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. PAUL ANTHONY ZANETTE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ZANETTE is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1997
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Jun 1999