Zanganeh, Shahin (CPSO#: 74954)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2000

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 13 Jul 2004

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:McGill University, 2000

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Windsor Allergy Asthma Associates
1407 Ottawa Street
Windsor ON  N8X 2G1
Phone: (519) 258-4356
Fax: (519) 258-9918
Electoral District: 01
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Shahin Zanganeh Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 14 2016

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Zanganeh ( CPSO# 74954 )

Business Address:
Windsor Allergy Asthma Associates
1407 Ottawa Street
Windsor ON  N8X 2G1
Phone Number: (519) 258-4356

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Windsor Regional Hospital,Metropolitan Site Windsor
Windsor Regional Hospital,Ouellette Campus Windsor

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2004 RCPSC Specialist
Clinical Immunology and Allergy Effective: 17 Sep 2005 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SHAHIN ZANGANEH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ZANGANEH is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 4 - Clinical Immunology and Allergy

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 5 - Clinical Immunology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2000
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 13 Jul 2004