Zangeneh-Kazemi, Azadeh (CPSO#: 96098)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2011

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2017

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Persian

Education:Iran Univ.of Med Sciences & Hlth Service, 2005

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
St Joseph's Healthcare
Centre for Moutain Health Services
Dept of Psy and Behavioural Science
100 West 5th Street
Hamilton ON  L8N 3K7
Phone: (905) 522-1155 Ext. 33697
Fax: 9055216120
Electoral District: 04

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hamilton Health Sciences,General Site Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences,Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre Hamilton
St Joseph's Centre for Mountain Health Services Hamilton
St Joseph's Healthcare System,Hamilton Hamilton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 30 Jun 2017 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. AZADEH ZANGENEH-KAZEMI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ZANGENEH-KAZEMI is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2011 to 23 Sep 2011
Assessment Verification Period - Psychiatry

McMaster University, 24 Sep 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Psychiatry

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Psychiatry

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - Psychiatry

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 4 - Psychiatry

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 4 - Psychiatry

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2016 to 12 Jul 2016
PostGrad Yr 4 - Psychiatry

McMaster University, 13 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 24 Sep 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2017