Zaniewski, Gregory Adam (CPSO#: 94336)

Current Status: Active Member as of 26 Jan 2011

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 26 Jan 2011

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Polish

Education:Jagiellonian University, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
The Peterborough Clinic
26 Hospital Drive
Peterborough ON  K9J 7C3
Phone: (705) 740-6849
Fax: (705) 743-4392
Electoral District: 06
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: G.A. Zaniewski Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 04 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. G. Zaniewski ( CPSO# 94336 )

Business Address:
The Peterborough Clinic
26 Hospital Drive
Suite 202
Peterborough ON  K9J 7C3
Phone Number: (705) 743-2040

Business Address:
1 Hospital Drive
Peterborough ON  K9J 7C6
Phone Number: (705) 743-2121

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Peterborough Regional Health Centre Peterborough

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 16 Dec 2010 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. GREGORY ADAM ZANIEWSKI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ZANIEWSKI is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 19 Aug 2010
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 18 Aug 2013
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 26 Jan 2011