Zapotocky, Michal (CPSO#: 107206)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Oct 2017

Expiry Date:  30 Jun 2018

CPSO Registration Class: PGE - Clinical Fellow as of 01 Oct 2017

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Charles Univ Prague, 2005

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
The Hospital for Sick Children
Division of Hematology/Oncology
555 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 1X8
Phone: (416) 813-7742
Electoral District: 10

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MICHAL ZAPOTOCKY may practise medicine only as required by the clinical or research fellowship program in which Dr. ZAPOTOCKY is enrolled at UNIVERSITY OF TORONTO;

(2) Dr. ZAPOTOCKY shall prescribe drugs only for in-patients or out-patients of a clinical teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the department where Dr. ZAPOTOCKY is properly practising medicine and to which postgraduate trainees are regularly assigned by the department as part of its program of postgraduate medical education;

(3) Dr. ZAPOTOCKY shall not charge a fee for medical services;

(4) The certificate expires on the earliest of the following times:

(i) When Dr. ZAPOTOCKY ceases to hold the appointment as a clinical or research fellow for which the certificate is issued,

(ii) When Dr. ZAPOTOCKY ceases to hold Canadian citizenship, permanent resident status or a valid employment authorization under the Immigration Act (Canada), or

(iii) When three years have elapsed from the date the certificate is issued.

Note: This certificate expires on 30 Jun 2018.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 04 Sep 2015
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Haematology/Oncology

University of Toronto, 05 Sep 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Haematology/Oncology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Haematology/Oncology

University of Toronto, 01 Oct 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Haematology/Oncology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2015
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 05 Sep 2015
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2017
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Oct 2017