Zarb, Therese Alexandra (CPSO#: 72510)

Current Status: Active Member as of 03 May 2005

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 03 May 2005

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Ottawa, 1998

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
SickKids CCMH
440 Jarvis Street
Toronto ON  M4Y 2H4
Phone: (416) 924-1164 Ext. 3327
Fax: (416) 972-1935
Electoral District: 10

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 29 Apr 2005 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. THERESE ALEXANDRA ZARB may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ZARB is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 1 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 2 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2000 to 21 May 2001
PostGrad Yr 2 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 22 May 2001 to 21 May 2002
PostGrad Yr 3 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 22 May 2002 to 18 Feb 2003
PostGrad Yr 4 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 19 Feb 2003 to 09 Dec 2003
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 21 Dec 2003 to 20 Dec 2004
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 21 Dec 2004 to 21 Feb 2005
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1998
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 21 Feb 2005
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 03 May 2005