Zareba, Piotr (CPSO#: 89086)

Current Status: Active Member as of 17 Jun 2014

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 17 Jun 2014

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Calgary, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Department of Surgery
Juravinski Hospital
711 Concession St
L8V 1C3
Hamilton ON  L8V 1C3
Phone: (905) 521-2100 Ext. Ext 47109
Fax: (905) 521-8333
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Zareba Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 25 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. P. Zareba ( CPSO# 89086 )

Business Address:
No business address available

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

USA - New York

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Urology Effective: 25 May 2014 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. PIOTR ZAREBA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ZAREBA is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Urology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Urology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 3 - Urology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2011 to 31 Mar 2012
PostGrad Yr 3 - Urology

McMaster University, 01 Apr 2012 to 31 Mar 2013
PostGrad Yr 4 - Urology

McMaster University, 01 Apr 2013 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 5 - Urology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2013 to 31 Mar 2014
PostGrad Yr 5 - Urology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Mar 2014
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 17 Jun 2014