Zareef, Shaista Khanam (CPSO#: 71088)

Current Status: Active Member as of 07 Feb 2002

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 07 Feb 2002

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Panjabi/Punjabi, Urdu

Education:McGill University, 1997

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Caremedics Kanata Inc
5357 Fernbank Road
Kanata ON  K2S 1B6
Phone: (631) 831-7300
Fax: (613) 831-7377
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Shaista Zareef Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 01 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Zareef ( CPSO# 71088 )

Business Address:
5357 Fernbank Road
Kanata ON  K2S 1B6
Phone Number: (613) 831-7300

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 09 Jun 1999 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SHAISTA KHANAM ZAREEF may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ZAREEF is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1997
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1999
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 07 Feb 2002