Zaremba, Janina (CPSO#: 58745)

Current Status: Active Member as of 30 Aug 1991

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Aug 1991

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Polish

Education:Academy of Medicine, Warsaw, 1971

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
1935 Bank Street
Ottawa ON  K1V 8A3
Phone: (613) 521-2391 Ext. 131
Fax: (613) 521-5443
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Zaremba Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 09 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Zaremba ( CPSO# 58745 )

Business Address:
1935 Bank Street
Ottawa ON  K1V 8A3
Phone Number: (613) 521-2391

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JANINA ZAREMBA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ZAREMBA is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1987
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1989
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 21 May 1991
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 10 Jun 1991
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Aug 1991