Zaretsky, Ari Eliezer (CPSO#: 59611)

Current Status: Active Member as of 13 Jun 1988

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 11 Oct 1989

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1988

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite FG-24A
2075 Bayview Avenue
Toronto ON  M4N 3M5
Phone: (416) 480-5031
Fax: (416) 480-5070
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Ari Zaretsky Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 13 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Zaretsky ( CPSO# 59611 )

Business Address:
Room FG-24A
2075 Bayview Avenue
Toronto ON  M4N 3M5
Phone Number: (416) 480-5031

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre,Holland Orthopaedic & Arthritic Centre Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 30 Jun 1993 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ARI ELIEZER ZARETSKY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ZARETSKY is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 13 Jun 1988 to 12 Jun 1989
Other - Comprehensive Internship

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Resident 1 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Resident 2 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Resident 3 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 4 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
Clinical Fellow - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 13 Jun 1988
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 11 Oct 1989