Zaretsky, Ashley Brooke (CPSO#: 98075)

Current Status: Active Member as of 14 Aug 2015

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 14 Aug 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 2012

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
77 Provost Dr
North York ON  M2K 0B7
Phone: 416-901-7407
Electoral District: 10
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

10 Trench Street
Richmond Hill
Richmond Hill ON  L4C 4Z3
Canada
Phone: 905-883-1212
Fax: 905-883-2455
County: Regional Municipality of York
Electoral District: 05

#5-10 Meadowglen Drive
Whitby ON  L1R3P8
Canada
Phone: 647-872-9958
County: Regional Municipality of Durham
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Ashley Zaretsky Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 09 2017

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Zaretsky ( CPSO# 98075 )

Business Address:
77 Provost Drive
North York ON  M2K 0B7
Phone Number: (416) 901-7407

Business Address:
Doctors on Call
10 Meadowglen Drive
Unit 5
Whitby ON  L1R 3P8
Phone Number: (647) 872-9958

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Mackenzie Health,Richmond Hill Richmond Hill

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 22 Jun 2015 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ASHLEY BROOKE ZARETSKY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ZARETSKY is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 31 May 2015
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2012
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 May 2015
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 14 Aug 2015