Zaretsky, Karolyn Rebecca (CPSO#: 61020)

Current Status: Active Member as of 12 Jun 1989

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 24 Jun 2015

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1989

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
2-462 Paxton St
Port Perry ON  L9L 1L9
Phone: (416) 566-4551
Fax: (416) 782-2072
Electoral District: 05

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective: 30 Jun 1994 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 12 Jun 1989 to 11 Jun 1990
Other - Rotating Internship

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Resident 1 - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Resident 2 - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Clinical Fellow - Diagnostic Radiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 12 Jun 1989
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 02 Jan 1991
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 24 Jun 2015
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by member Effective: 24 Jun 2015

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
member Effective: 24 Jun 2015 Active View Details [+]
            As from June 24, 2015, the following is imposed as a term, condition and
            limitation on the certificate of registration held by Dr. Karolyn Rebecca
            Zaretsky, in accordance with an undertaking and consent given by Dr. Zaretsky
            to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario:

                  Dr. Zaretsky is prohibited from prescribing any drug or substance for
                  which a prescription is required.