Zarif, Hawazen Abdullah M (CPSO#: 77149)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 31 Aug 2004

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 31 Aug 2004

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:King Abdul Aziz University, 1991

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Nov 2001 to 31 Oct 2002
PostGrad Yr 4 - Endocrinology and Metabolism

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Nov 2002 to 31 Oct 2003
PostGrad Yr 5 - Endocrinology and Metabolism

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Nov 2003 to 31 Aug 2004
Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Endocrinology and Metabolism

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Nov 2001
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Aug 2004