Zarins, Raymond Kenneth (CPSO#: 21829)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 10 Jun 1997

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 10 Jun 1997

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1967

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Orthopedic Surgery Effective: 07 Nov 1973 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 24 Jun 1967
Transfer of class of registration to: Canadian Grads (No MCC) Certificate Effective: 19 Jun 1968
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Mar 1969
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 08 Oct 1969
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1970
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 31 Mar 1981
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 May 1984
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 10 Jun 1997