Zarnett, Mark Eric (CPSO#: 52702)

Current Status: Active Member as of 13 Jun 1983

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 23 Jul 1984

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1983

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
5th Floor
150 Eglinton Avenue East
Toronto ON  M4P 1E8
Phone: (416) 636-9965
Fax: (416) 636-9119
Electoral District: 10

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Don Mills Surgical Unit Limited Toronto
Humber River Hospital,Wilson Site Toronto
St Michael's Hospital Toronto
West Park Healthcare Centre Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Orthopedic Surgery Effective: 23 Nov 1989 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MARK ERIC ZARNETT may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ZARNETT is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 13 Jun 1983 to 11 Jun 1984
Other - Comprehensive Internship

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1984 to 30 Jun 1985
Research Fellows - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1985 to 30 Jun 1986
Resident 2 - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1986 to 30 Jun 1987
Resident 3 - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Resident 5 - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Clinical Fellow - Orthopedic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 13 Jun 1983
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Jul 1984