Zarychanski, Ryan Lawrence (CPSO#: 78363)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2009

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2009

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Ottawa, 2000

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2004 RCPSC Specialist
Hematology Effective: 21 Sep 2005 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 05 Aug 2002 to 29 Aug 2002
Elective Trainee - Hematology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
Clinical Fellow - Clinician Investigator

University of Ottawa, 01 Sep 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
Clinical Fellow - Clinician Investigator

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2008 to 31 Aug 2008
Clinical Fellow - Clinician Investigator

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 05 Aug 2002
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 29 Aug 2002
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 02 Jun 2006
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2009