Zassoko, Roman (CPSO#: 90541)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2009

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 20 Dec 2012

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Russian

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Etobicoke Medical Centre
Family Health Team
85 The East Mall
Suite 400
Etobicoke ON  M8Z 5W4
Phone: (416) 621-2220
Fax: (416) 621-2203
Electoral District: 10

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Trillium Health Partners,Mississauga Hospital Mississauga

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 20 Dec 2012 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ROMAN ZASSOKO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ZASSOKO is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 31 Dec 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jan 2012 to 31 Dec 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Dec 2012