Zatelny, Diane Lynn (CPSO#: 51881)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Jun 1982

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 23 Jun 1988

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Ottawa, 1982

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
128 Penetang Street
Suite 206
Barrie ON  L4M 1V6
Phone: (705) 734-3888
Fax: 705-726-0806
Electoral District: 05
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Royal Victoria Hospital
201 Georgian Drive
Barrie ON  L4M 6M2
Canada
Phone: (705) 728-9802
County: County of Simcoe
Electoral District: 05

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Royal Victoria Regional Health Centre Barrie

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 21 Nov 1986 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. DIANE LYNN ZATELNY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ZATELNY is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 15 Jun 1982 to 14 Jun 1983
Other - Comprehensive Internship

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1983 to 30 Jun 1984
Resident 1 - Internal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1984 to 30 Jun 1985
Resident 2 - Internal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1985 to 30 Jun 1986
Resident 4 - Internal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1986 to 30 Jun 1987
Resident 4 - Endocrinology and Metabolism

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1987 to 30 Jun 1988
Resident 5 - Endocrinology and Metabolism

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1982
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Jun 1988