Zaugg, Kathrin (CPSO#: 75793)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 31 Aug 2002

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 31 Aug 2002

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:University of Zurich, 1992

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Sep 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
Clinical Fellow - Radiation Oncology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
Clinical Fellow - Radiation Oncology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2002 to 31 Aug 2002
Clinical Fellow - Radiation Oncology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 18 Dec 2000
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Aug 2002