Zawada, Annabella (CPSO#: 79494)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2003

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 27 Jun 2005

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Polish

Education:University of Toronto, 2003

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
955 Oliver Road - Prettie Res
Thunder Bay ON  P7B 6E7
Phone: (807) 343-8361
Fax: (807) 346-7740
Electoral District: 09
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Annabella Zawada Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 27 2005

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Zawada ( CPSO# 79494 )

Business Address:
999 Balmoral Street
Thunder Bay ON  P7B 6E7
Phone Number: (807) 625-5900

Business Address:
955 Oliver Road
Suite Prettie Res.
Thunder Bay ON  P7B 5E1
Phone Number: (807) 343-8361

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Thunder Bay Regional Health Sciences Centre Thunder Bay

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 15 Jun 2005 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ANNABELLA ZAWADA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ZAWADA is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2003
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Jun 2005