Zawadowski, Andrew George Adam (CPSO#: 30799)

Current Status: Active Member as of 14 Jun 1978

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 21 Jun 1979

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Polish

Education:McMaster University, 1978

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
109 Thomas St.
unit 69547
Oakville ON  L6J 7R4
Phone: (905) 842-2865
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Andrew Zawadowski Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 08 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Zawadowski ( CPSO# 30799 )

Business Address:
Suite 215
1060 Speers Road
Oakville ON  L6L 2X4
Phone Number: (905) 842-6084

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Oakville Trafalgar Memorial Hospital Oakville

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 07 Jun 1982 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ANDREW GEORGE ADAM ZAWADOWSKI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ZAWADOWSKI is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 14 Jun 1978
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 13 Jun 1979
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Jun 1979