Zawarynski, Diane Mary (CPSO#: 72578)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1998

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 28 Jun 2000

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1998

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Tillsonburg Medical Centre
200 Broadway Street
Tillsonburg ON  N4G 5A7
Phone: (519) 842-4231
Fax: (519) 842-6955
Electoral District: 02
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Diane Zawarynski Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 04 2018

Shareholders:
Dr. D. Zawarynski ( CPSO# 72578 )

Business Address:
Tillsonburg Medical Centre
Suite 13
200 Broadway Street
Tillsonburg ON  N4G 5A7
Phone Number: (519) 842-4231

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 14 Jun 2000 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. DIANE MARY ZAWARYNSKI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ZAWARYNSKI is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1998
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Jun 2000