Zayid, Omar Ismail (CPSO#: 71295)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1997

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 19 Jun 1999

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Dalhousie University, 1997

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Argus Medical Centre
Suite 300
581 Argus Road
Oakville ON  L6J 3J4
Phone: (905) 338-9900
Fax: (905) 338-9904
Electoral District: 04

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Oakville Trafalgar Memorial Hospital Oakville

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. OMAR ISMAIL ZAYID may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ZAYID is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1997
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Jun 1999