Zbieranowski, Ingrid Joan (CPSO#: 52775)

Current Status: Expired: Emeritus status as of 10 Apr 2015

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 10 Apr 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1983

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anatomical Pathology Effective: 14 Dec 1988 RCPSC Specialist

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 13 Jun 1983 to 11 Jun 1984
Other - Rotating Internship

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1984 to 30 Jun 1985
Resident 1 - Anatomical Pathology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1985 to 30 Jun 1986
Resident 2 - Anatomical Pathology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1986 to 30 Jun 1987
Resident 3 - Anatomical Pathology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1987 to 30 Jun 1988
Resident 4 - Anatomical Pathology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Resident 4 - Anatomical Pathology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 13 Jun 1983
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Sep 1987
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 10 Apr 2015