Zbuk, Kevin Michael (CPSO#: 76742)

Current Status: Active Member as of 29 Jun 2001

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 29 Jun 2001

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Alberta, 1997

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Medical Oncology
Juravinski Cancer Centre
699 Concession Street
Hamilton ON  L8V 5C2
Phone: (905) 387-9495 Ext. 64604
Fax: (905) 575-6326
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Zou and Zbuk Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 07 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. L. Zou ( CPSO# 76716 )
Dr. K. Zbuk ( CPSO# 76742 )

Business Address:
Medical Oncology
Juravinski Cancer Centre
699 Concession Street
Hamilton ON  L8V 5C2
Phone Number: (905) 387-9495

Business Address:
201 - 133 King Street West
Dundas ON  L9H 1V3
Phone Number: (905) 628-6355

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hamilton Health Sciences,Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre Hamilton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 20 Jun 2001 RCPSC Specialist
Medical Oncology Effective: 31 Dec 2004 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. KEVIN MICHAEL ZBUK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ZBUK is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jan 2003 to 31 Dec 2003
PostGrad Yr 4 - Medical Oncology

McMaster University, 01 Jan 2004 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 5 - Medical Oncology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2004 to 31 Dec 2004
PostGrad Yr 5 - Medical Oncology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Jun 2001