Zelcer, Irving (CPSO#: 22484)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 10 Aug 2016

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 10 Aug 2016

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Yiddish

Education:University of Toronto, 1968

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Instructions: Patients who are looking to request a copy of their medical records can send a written request to: overbrook-medical@hotmail.com.
Date Received: 05 Jul 2016

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Jul 1976 CFPC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1968
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Dec 1969
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 10 Aug 2016

Concerns

Source: Member
Active Date: August 10, 2016
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Summary of the Undertaking given by Dr. Irving Zelcer to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario, effective August 10, 2016
.
Dr. Zelcer was the subject of a College investigation into whether he failed to maintain the standard of practice. During this investigation, Dr. Zelcer resigned from the College and has agreed never to apply or reapply for registration as a physician in Ontario or any other jurisdiction.

See PDF for full undertaking.
Download Full Document (PDF)