Zeldin, Edmond Toby (CPSO#: 26546)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2000

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2000

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1973

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 21 Nov 1979 RCPSC Specialist

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1977 to 30 Jun 1978
Resident 4 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1978 to 30 Jun 1979
Resident 5 - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 18 Jun 1973
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Jun 1974
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 31 May 1975
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Jun 1977
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 25 May 1982
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 08 Feb 1999
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2000