Zeller, Jeanne Therese (CPSO#: 89813)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Jan 2011

Expiry Date:  14 Jan 2019

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 15 Jan 2011

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:Universite of Rene Descartes (Paris V), 1991

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
St Joseph's Health Centre
Division of Dermatology
30 The Queensway
Toronto ON  M6R 1B5
Phone: (416) 530-6043
Fax: (416) 530-6472
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: R & J Zeller Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 12 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Zeller ( CPSO# 89813 )
Dr. R. Zeller ( CPSO# 85741 )

Business Address:
The Hospital for Sick Children
Division of Orthopaedic Surgery
555 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 1X8
Phone Number: (416) 813-6265

Business Address:
St Joseph's Health Centre
Division of Dermatology
30 The Queensway
Toronto ON  M6R 1B5
Phone Number: (416) 530-6043

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
St Joseph's Health Centre,Toronto Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Dermatology Effective: 15 Jan 2011 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Sep 2008 to 17 Nov 2008
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Dermatology

University of Toronto, 18 Nov 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
Clinical Fellow - Dermatology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 31 Aug 2010
Clinical Fellow - Dermatology

University of Toronto, 01 Sep 2010 to 14 Jan 2011
Clinical Fellow - Dermatology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Sep 2008
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 18 Nov 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 14 Jan 2011
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 15 Jan 2011
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 14 Jan 2018
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 14 Dec 2017
Terms and conditions amended by Effective: 14 Jan 2019

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
Registration Committee Effective: 14 Dec 2017 Active View Details [+]
            1.    Dr. Jeanne Therese Zeller may practise medicine only,

                  (i)   in a setting that is approved by the Chair, Department of Medicine,
                        Division of Dermatology, University of Toronto, in which Dr. Zeller
                        holds  an  academic appointment at the rank of Assistant Professor,
                        and
                  
                  (ii)  in accordance with the requirements of her academic appointment.
                  
            2.    The certificate of  registration  automatically  expire on the earlier of
                  the following times:

                  (i)   on January 14, 2019,
                  
                  (ii)  when  Dr. Zeller no longer holds the academic  appointment  at  the
                        rank of Assistant Professor in the Department of Medicine, Division
                        of Dermatology at the University of Toronto, or
                  
                  (iii) when the  Committee makes a decision about Dr. Zeller's certificate
                        of registration, following consideration of the practice assessment
                        report.
                  
            3.    The certificate of  registration automatically expires upon the following
                  events, unless the Registration  Committee renews the certificate with or
                  without additional or other terms, conditions and limitations:

                  (i)   the College receives a report indicating that Dr. Zeller's clinical
                        performance, knowledge, skill,  judgment,  professional conduct, or
                        academic progress is unsatisfactory, or
                  
                  (ii)  the  Committee  does  not receive an annual report  or  receives  a
                        report that is unsatisfactory in form or content.
                  
                  
            Note: This certificate is issued on  January  15,  2011.   In  accordance  with
                  paragraphs  2  and 3 above, this certificate will, if not extended by the
                  Registration Committee, automatically expire on January 14, 2019.