Zeman, Marilyn Vera (CPSO#: 80747)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 16 Jul 2010

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 16 Jul 2010

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Calgary, 2002

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2006 RCPSC Specialist
Gastroenterology Effective: 02 Oct 2007 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 31 May 2004 to 30 Jun 2004
Elective Trainee - Gastroenterology

The University of Western Ontario, 23 Aug 2004 to 19 Sep 2004
Elective Trainee - Gastroenterology

University of Toronto, 29 Jan 2007 to 25 Feb 2007
Elective Trainee - Gastroenterology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 31 May 2004
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2004
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Aug 2004
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 19 Sep 2004
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 29 Jan 2007
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 25 Feb 2007
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 12 Jun 2008
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 16 Jul 2010