Zeman, Robert (CPSO#: 23792)

Current Status: Active Member as of 06 Jul 1971

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 06 Jul 1971

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Czech, English, Polish, Slovak

Education:P.J. Safarika University, 1959

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: Records Management Ltd, 1 High Meadow Place, Unit 13, Toronto, ON M9L 0A3, 1-800-775-0093
Date Received: 06 Aug 2015

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 28 Mar 1973 RCPSC Specialist
Nuclear Medicine Effective: 24 Nov 1976 RCPSC Specialist
Endocrinology and Metabolism Effective: 05 Sep 1985 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ROBERT ZEMAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ZEMAN is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 21 Mar 1969
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 20 Mar 1970
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1970
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Dec 1970
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 06 Jul 1971