Zener, Shery Helen Kales (CPSO#: 26713)

Current Status: Active Member as of 10 Jul 1974

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 10 Jul 1974

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Yiddish

Education:University of Toronto, 1973

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Michael Garron Hospital
825 Coxwell Avenue
Room 513- H Wing- 5th Floor
Toronto ON  M4C 3E7
Phone: (416) 469-6580 Ext. 7742
Fax: 416-469-6805
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Shery Zener Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 23 2017

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Zener ( CPSO# 26713 )

Business Address:
Michael Garron Hospital
825 Coxwell Avenue
Room 513 H-Wing 5th Floor
Toronto ON  M4C 3E7
Phone Number: (416) 469-6580

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 20 Nov 1979 RCPSC Specialist
Geriatric Psychiatry Effective: 21 Sep 2015 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SHERY HELEN KALES ZENER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ZENER is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 18 Jun 1973
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 16 Jun 1974
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 10 Jul 1974